skip to content

Sichilima, Tangu

CPSO#: 85254

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Manchester Medical School, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
525 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E2
Phone: (519) 880-3695
Fax: (519) 749-2452 Electoral District: 03

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:09 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TANGU SICHILIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SICHILIMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Aug 2006
AVP - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 31 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 23 Apr 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Apr 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2010