skip to content

Sibley, Stephanie Ruth

CPSO#: 88739

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Critical Care
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3399 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Sibley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Sibley ( CPSO# 88739 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-2368

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 21 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. STEPHANIE RUTH SIBLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIBLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 7 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013