skip to content

Sibley, Christopher Daniel

CPSO#: 100523

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Calgary, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Laserderm
1600 Carling Ave
6th Floor
Ottawa ON  K1Z 1G3
Phone: (613) 722-4436 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

1650 Queensdale Ave
Unit 2
Ottawa ON  K1T1N8
Canada
Phone: 613-244-4400
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER DANIEL SIBLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIBLEY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 15 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 16 Aug 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2017 to 15 Aug 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 16 Aug 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 13 Aug 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018