skip to content

Shuster, Anatoly

CPSO#: 90099

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 30 Aug 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 30 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew, Russian

Education:Russian State Medical University (RSMU), 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6431 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A Shuster Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shuster ( CPSO# 90099 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
Department of Medical Imaging
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7C7
Phone Number: (807) 684-6363

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Manitouwadge General Hospital Manitouwadge
McCausland Hospital Terrace Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Wilson Memorial General Hospital Marathon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective:01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jan 2009 to 21 Feb 2009
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 22 Feb 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Apr 2011
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Feb 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2019 Active
 Dr.   Anatoly   Shuster  may  practise  medicine  independently  in  diagnostic
            radiology.