skip to content

Shurshilova, Elena

CPSO#: 94752

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Feb 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Feb 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Russian

Education:Saratov State Medical University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
550 Byrne road
Yellowknife NT  X1A0H1
Phone: 8676694111

Additional Practice Location(s)

4915 48 street
Yellowknife NT  X1A1N2
Canada
Phone: (867)920-7777
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Elena Shurshilova Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Shurshilova ( CPSO# 94752 )

Business Address:
201 - 5102 50th Avenue
Yellowknife YT  X1A 3S8
Phone Number: (867) 767-9107

Business Address:
595 Pinawa Circle
Nepean ON  K2J 5Y2


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Northwest Territories

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELENA SHURSHILOVA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHURSHILOVA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 18 Jan 2011 to 11 Apr 2011
EL - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2015