skip to content

Shupak, Michael

CPSO#: 24807

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Feb 2020

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1971

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Michael Shupak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 17 2021

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical records storage facility: Records management Ltd. Paitents looking to obtain copies of their medical charts should contact toll free: 1-800-775-0093 www.recordsregistry.ca or 13 - 1 High Meadow Place Toronto ON M9L 0A3
Date Received: 04 Jul 2019


Address: Contact Records Management Ltd. at 1-800-775-0093
Date Received: 03 Jun 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1972
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2020
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 05 Feb 2020
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Aug 2020