skip to content

Shuman, Mira Rebecca

CPSO#: 90701

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 May 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Family Medicine
Suite A102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (416) 480-4931 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bay Centre for Birth Control
76 Grenville St Floor 3
Toronto
on
Toronto ON  M4R 1Z2
Canada
Phone: 416-351-3726
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Mira Shuman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shuman ( CPSO# 90701 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Family Medicine
A102
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-4931

Business Address:
76 Grenville Street
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5S 3B2
Phone Number: (416) 351-3726

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MIRA REBECCA SHUMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUMAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 May 2012