skip to content

Shum, Andrew Sai-Chak

CPSO#: 30623

MEMBER STATUS
Revoked: Discipline Committee as of 11 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 27 Jul 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education: University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
 

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address:

Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc.  
111 St Regis Crescent S, Toronto, ON  M3J 1Y6  
Toll Free:  1-888-563-3732 ext. 1  
Fax:   416-398-5932  
Website:  www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 26 Jun 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 1979
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2012
Suspension of registration imposed: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Revoked: Discipline Committee. Effective: 11 Sep 2013

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 11 Sep 2013
Summary:

On September 11, 2013, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Shum committed and act of professional misconduct, in that he failed to maintain the standard of practice of the profession. The Committee also found that Dr. Shum is incompetent. Dr. Shum admitted the allegations.

Dr. Shum's infection control procedures and his maintenance of equipment in performing urologic procedures did not meet the standard of practice of the profession. He displayed a lack of both judgment and knowledge regarding what is required to safely practice invasive procedures in the ambulatory care setting. His multiple reprocessing and practice breaches put patients at risk of bacterial and viral cross colonization or infections.

Multiple deficiencies were identified in Dr. Shum's urologic practice, including with respect to prostate biopsy and cystoscopy, prostate cancer care, microscopic hematuria evaluation, and management of urethral stenosis including urethral dilatation. Dr. Shum failed to meet the standard of practice of the profession in his family practice with respect to record keeping and displayed a lack of knowledge with respect to various type of preventative screening. Dr. Shum's practice exposed patients to potential risk of harm.

On September 19, 2012, the Inquires, Complaints and Reports Committee ordered and directed the Registrar to suspend Dr. Shum's certificate of registration, without notice, under s. 37(6) of the Health Professions Procedural Code. He has not practised medicine since that date.

The Committee ordered and directed that:

( the Registrar revoke Dr. Shum's certificate of registration, effective immediately.
( Dr. Shum attend before the panel to be reprimanded.
( Dr. Shum pay to the College costs in the amount of $4,460 within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order.


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): September 11, 2013 1:00 p.m.