skip to content

Shum, Andrew James Ho-Tak

CPSO#: 91233

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Feb 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Feb 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of British Columbia Faculty o, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Michael Garron Hospital
Toronto East Health Network
825 Coxwell Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 469-6580 Ext. 7734
Fax: (416) 469-6259 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Canada
Phone: (905) 895-4521 Ext. 6619
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrew Shum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 03 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shum ( CPSO# 91233 )

Business Address:
Toronto East General Hospital
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 469-6580

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Hospital
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:19 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREW JAMES HO-TAK SHUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Feb 2012