skip to content

Shukla, Yajur

CPSO#: 93406

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Bayview Pulmonary Services
Suite 308
586 Eglinton Ave E
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: (647) 430-7191
Fax: (647) 430-5343 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Centre for Sleep & Chronobiology
Suite 301
295 College Street
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2
Canada
Phone: (416) 746-3012
Fax: (416) 603-2388
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Windsor Sleep Disorders Clinic
55 Edinborough Street, Unit 100
Windsor, ON, N8X 3C3
Windsor ON  N8X3C3
Canada
Phone: 519-258-0585
Fax: 519-258-6304
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Yajur Shukla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Shukla ( CPSO# 93406 )

Business Address:
55 Edingborough Street
Unit 100
Windsor ON  N8X 3C3

Business Address:
Bayview CardioPulmonary Services
586 Eglinton Avenue East
Suite 308
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (647) 430-7191

Business Address:
295 College Street
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M5T 1S2
Phone Number: (416) 603-9531

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Respirology Effective:19 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YAJUR SHUKLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUKLA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Respiratory Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Respiratory Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014