skip to content

Shukla, Avanish Kumar

CPSO#: 30442

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 07 Nov 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 07 Nov 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi

Education:University of Lucknow, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. K. Shukla Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 26 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St. Regis Crescent South Toronto ON M3J 1Y8 Tel: 1-888-563-3732 Ext. 1 www.GetMyRecord.ca
Date Received: 11 Nov 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Oct 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 07 Nov 2016