skip to content

Shugarman, Laurel Gilda Douglas

CPSO#: 28318

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Sep 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Jun 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1983 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 15 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Sep 2020