skip to content

Shuffield, James Walter

CPSO#: 92401

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Univ of North Texas at Fort Worth (TCOM), 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
271 Frances St
Box 188
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone: (519) 357-3915 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

270 Carling Terrace
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Canada
County: County of Huron
Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. James Shuffield Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shuffield ( CPSO# 92401 )

Business Address:
271 Frances Street
Box 188
Wingham ON  N0G 2W0
Phone Number: (519) 357-1325

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Wingham and District Hospital Wingham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:14 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JAMES WALTER SHUFFIELD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHUFFIELD is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 17 Sep 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2012