skip to content

Shub, Elliot Henry

CPSO#: 28750

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Sep 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:University of Cape Town Faculty of Healt, 1966

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Elliot Shub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 12 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Suite 701 240 Duncan Mill Road Toronto, ON M3B 3SG 416-229-6300
Date Received: 27 May 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1975
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016