skip to content

Shu, Krishanthy

CPSO#: 90005

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Jan 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese, Tamil

Education:University of Jaffna, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King Edward Health Centre
280 King Edward Ave
London ON  N5Z 3V3
Phone: (519) 4511363
Fax: 519 451 9395 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Shu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shu ( CPSO# 90005 )
Dr. G. Shu ( CPSO# 94537 )

Business Address:
280 King Edward Ave.
London ON  N5Z 3V3
Phone Number: (519) 451-1363

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:16 Dec 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KRISHANTHY SHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Nov 2008 to 23 Jan 2009
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 24 Jan 2009 to 31 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Nov 2009 to 31 Oct 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jan 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jan 2011