skip to content

Shu, Jenny

CPSO#: 98074

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2330 Kennedy Road
Suite 210
Toronto ON  M1T 0A2
Phone: (416) 335-1717
Fax: (416) 335-1719 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

3333 Brimley Rd. Unit A
Toronto ON  M1V2J7
Canada
Phone: 4162920089
Fax: 4163210089
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jenny Shu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shu ( CPSO# 98074 )

Business Address:
Suite 210
2330 Kennedy Road
Toronto ON  M1T 0A2
Phone Number: (416) 335-1717

Business Address:
A-3333 Brimley Rd
Scarborough ON  M1V 2J7
Phone Number: 416-292-0089

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:24 Oct 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JENNY SHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016