skip to content

Shu, Gerard You Cheng

CPSO#: 94537

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:North Colombo Medical College, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
King Edward Health Centre
280 King Edward Avenue
London ON  N5Z 3V3
Phone: (519) 451 1363
Fax: (519) 451 9395 Electoral District: 02

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: K. Shu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 09 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shu ( CPSO# 94537 )
Dr. K. Shu ( CPSO# 90005 )

Business Address:
CML Healthcare
124 Barker Street
London ON  N5Y 1Y1
Phone Number: (519) 451-1363


Corporation Name: G. Shu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shu ( CPSO# 94537 )

Business Address:
Carling Heights Health Centre
124 Barker Street
London ON  N5Y 1Y1
Phone Number: (519) 451-1363

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GERARD YOU CHENG SHU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2010 to 11 Jan 2011
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 12 Jan 2011 to 18 Oct 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 19 Oct 2011 to 18 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Oct 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Oct 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013