skip to content

Showail, Mahmood Jameel M

CPSO#: 92594

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2021
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr Showail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 23 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 03 May 2010 to 07 Jun 2010
PEAP - R - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 08 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Ophthalmology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021