skip to content

Showail, Mahmood Jameel M

CPSO#: 92594

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr Showail Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 23 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 03 May 2010 to 07 Jun 2010
PEAP - R - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 08 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 11 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2021

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Mahmood Jameel M. Showail may practise ophthalmology at 2330 Wyecroft
                  Road and Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital in Oakville, Ontario, while
                  under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable to the College.

            2.    The  certificate  of  registration automatically expires three years from
                  the date of issuance.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of  any  concerns regarding Dr.
                        Showail's knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude,  does not provide
                        the  required  reports  to the College by the due date  or  if  the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Showail's practice.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on  July 1, 2018, and will expire on or before
                  June 30, 2021, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.