skip to content

Shoush, Suzanne

CPSO#: 89142

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St. Michael's - Department of Famil
Sumac Creek Health Centre
73 Regent Park Boulevard, 3rd floor
Toronto ON  M5A 2B7
Phone: (416) 864-3022
Fax: (416)864-6051 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Shoush Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shoush ( CPSO# 89142 )

Business Address:
73 Regent Park Boulevard
3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5A 2B7
Phone Number: (416) 864-3022

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SUZANNE SHOUSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOUSH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2010