skip to content

Shourideh-Ziabari, Sayed Mostafa Amir

CPSO#: 84622

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Shouridh-Ziabary, Sayed Mostafa (used until: 04 Dec 2007 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone: (705) 727-7688
Fax: (705) 734-6284 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Barrie Family Medicine Clinics
Unit 2
829 Big Bay Point Rd
Innisfil, ontario
Barrie ON  L9S0A1
Canada
Phone: 705 721 1689
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shourideh-Ziabari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 15 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shourideh-Ziabari ( CPSO# 84622 )

Business Address:
Suite 203
480 Huronia Road
Barrie ON  L4N 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 727-7688

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jul 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SAYED MOSTAFA AMIR SHOURIDEH-ZIABARI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOURIDEH-ZIABARI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2008
The CPSO will be closed for the statutory holiday on Monday, October 14, 2019. We will re-open at 8 a.m. on Tuesday, October 15.