skip to content

Shour, Rachel Shira

CPSO#: 93533

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 54011 Lawrence Plaza PO
North York ON  M6A 3B7
Phone: 416-784-9366
Fax: 1-866-765-1487 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shour Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Shour ( CPSO# 93533 )

Business Address:
305-745 Mount Pleasant Road
Toronto ON  M4S 2N4
Phone Number: (416) 487-2052

Medical Records Location

Address: Futurity Medical 745 Mt. Pleasant Road Suite 305 Toronto, ON M4S 2N4
Date Received: 08 Dec 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:31 May 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RACHEL SHIRA SHOUR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOUR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 15 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 16 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
CF - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 31 Oct 2020
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2013