skip to content

Shoughary, Ali Toufic

CPSO#: 87997

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:American University of Beirut, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carefor center enetrence B
700 Mackay St
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G6
Phone: (613) 732-3424
Fax: (613) 735-8311 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. Shoughary Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Shoughary ( CPSO# 87997 )

Business Address:
700 Mackay Street
Pembroke ON  K8A 1G6
Phone Number: (613) 717-5054

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:27 Aug 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALI TOUFIC SHOUGHARY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOUGHARY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 14 Jan 2008 to 12 Jul 2008
International Specialist Physician - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 May 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Sep 2010