skip to content

Shoucri, Rami

CPSO#: 98112

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University Of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sumac Creek Health Centre
73 Regent Park Blvd. 3rd Floor
Toronto ON  M5A 2B7
Phone: 416-864-3022
Fax: 416-864-6051 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Weeneebayko General Hospital
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L1W0
Canada
Phone: 705-658-4544
Fax: 705-658-5877
County: Territorial District of Cochrane
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Rami Shoucri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 5 2021

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RAMI SHOUCRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOUCRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2014