skip to content

Shore, Frederica Debora

CPSO#: 32080

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Nov 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 1980

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 1P1
Phone: (416) 743-5853
Fax: (416) 743-1358 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Shore Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. F. Shore ( CPSO# 32080 )

Business Address:
Unit 2
123 Rexdale Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9W 1P1
Phone Number: (416) 743-5853

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. FREDERICA DEBORA SHORE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHORE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 18 Jun 1979 to 16 Jun 1980
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 1980