skip to content

Shoots, Laura J

CPSO#: 100490

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brantford General Hospital
Department of Emergency Medicine
200 Terrace Hill St
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone: (519) 751-5544 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

3045 Baseline Rd, Nepean, ON
Nepean ON  K2H 8P4
Canada
Phone: 613-721-2000
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:15 Jun 2015 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:21 Oct 2016 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA J SHOOTS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOOTS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 23 Aug 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2016