skip to content

Shoop, Rebecca Rachel

CPSO#: 90642

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jan 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jan 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2330 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Parkview Rd.
Hagersville ON  N1R 1A0
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Monkhouse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Apr 17 2017

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Dec 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. REBECCA RACHEL SHOOP may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOOP is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Nov 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Dec 2010 to 30 Nov 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2012