skip to content

Shomair, Garry Yehudah

CPSO#: 27726

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 19 Aug 1975
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 23 Aug 2019
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1-121 Old Forest Hill Rd
Toronto ON  M5N 2N6
Phone: (416) 488-5189
Fax: (416) 486-8468 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. G. Y. Shomair Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 27 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Shomair ( CPSO# 27726 )

Business Address:
1-121 Old Forest Hill Road
Toronto ON  M5N 2N6
Phone Number: (416) 488-5189

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 21 Nov 1978 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1975
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Inquiries, Complaints and Repo Effective: 04 Oct 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 27 Apr 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2018
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by member Effective: 23 Aug 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
member Effective: 23 Aug 2019 Active
             As from August 23, 2019, the following is imposed as terms, conditions and
            limitations on the certificate of registration held by Dr. Garry Yehudah
            Shomair in accordance with an undertaking and consent given by Dr. Shomair to
            the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario:

                        UNDERTAKING, ACKNOWLEDGEMENT AND CONSENT 
                                          ("Undertaking")
                  
                                                of
                  
                  
                                    DR. GARRY Y. SHOMAIR
                                          ("Dr. Shomair")
                  
                                                to 
                  
                        COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO
                                          (the "College")
                  
                  
                  
            A.    PREAMBLE

            (1)   In this Undertaking:

                  "Code" means the Health Professions Procedural Code, which is Schedule 2
                  to the Regulated Health Professions Act, 1991, S.O. 1991, c. 18, as
                  amended; 
                  
                  "Public Register" means the College's register that is available to the
                  public.
                  
            (2)   I, Dr. Shomair, certificate of registration number 27726, am a member of
                  the College.

            (3)   I, Dr. Shomair, acknowledge that following a public complaint, the
                  College conducted an investigation bearing File Number 76752 (the
                  "Investigation") into whether I engaged in professional misconduct and/or
                  am incompetent in my psychiatry practice.

            B.    UNDERTAKING

            (4)   I, Dr. Shomair, undertake to abide by the provisions of this Undertaking,
                  effective immediately.

            (5)   Professional Education  

                  (a)   I, Dr. Shomair, undertake to participate in and successfully
                        complete all aspects of the detailed IEP, attached hereto as
                        Appendix "A", including all of the following professional education
                        (the "Professional Education"):
                  
                        (i)   a program or programs satisfactory to the College in
                              pharmacology; and
                  
                        (ii)  review and summarize the policies and practice guidelines
                              listed in the attached IEP.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Shomair, undertake to provide proof to the College of my
                        successful completion of the Professional Education, including
                        proof of registration and attendance and participant assessment
                        reports, within one (1) month of completing it. I acknowledge that
                        the College will determine, in its sole discretion, whether I have
                        successfully completed the Professional Education.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Shomair, undertake to complete this requirement within six
                        (6) months, or if no satisfactory program is available by that
                        time, by the first possible opportunity thereafter.
                  
                  (d)   I, Dr. Shomair, acknowledge that a report or reports may be
                        provided to the College regarding my progress and compliance with
                        the Professional Education.
                  
            (6)   Monitoring 

                  (a)   I, Dr. Shomair, give my irrevocable consent to the College to make
                        appropriate enquiries of any person who or institution that may
                        have relevant information, in order for the College to monitor my
                        compliance with the provisions of this Undertaking. 
                  
            C.    ACKNOWLEDGEMENT

            (7)   I, Dr. Shomair, acknowledge that all appendices attached to or referred
                  to in this Undertaking form part of this Undertaking.

            (8)   I, Dr. Shomair, acknowledge and undertake that I shall be solely
                  responsible for payment of all fees, costs, charges, expenses, etc.
                  arising from the implementation of any of the provisions of this
                  Undertaking. 

            (9)   I, Dr. Shomair, acknowledge that I have read and understand the
                  provisions of this Undertaking and that I have obtained independent legal
                  counsel in reviewing and executing this Undertaking, or have waived my
                  right to do so.

            (10)  I, Dr. Shomair, acknowledge that the College will provide this
                  Undertaking to any Chief of Staff, or a colleague with similar
                  responsibilities, at any Practice Location ("Chief of Staff" or "Chiefs
                  of Staff").

            (11)  I, Dr. Shomair, acknowledge that a breach by me of any provision of this
                  Undertaking may constitute an act of professional misconduct and/or
                  incompetence, and may result in a referral of specified allegations to
                  the Discipline Committee of the College.

            (12)  I, Dr. Shomair, acknowledge that this Undertaking constitutes terms,
                  conditions, and limitations on my certificate of registration for the
                  purposes of section 23 of the Code. 

            (13)  Public Register

                  (a)   I, Dr. Shomair, acknowledge that, during the time period that this
                        Undertaking remains in effect, this Undertaking shall be posted on
                        the Public Register.
                  
                  (b)   I, Dr. Shomair, acknowledge that, in addition to this Undertaking
                        being posted in accordance with section (13)(a) above, the
                        following summary shall be posted on the Public Register during the
                        time period that this Undertaking remains in effect:
                  
                              A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr.
                              Shomair engaged in professional misconduct and/or is
                              incompetent in his psychiatry practice. As a result of the
                              investigation, Dr. Shomair will engage in professional
                              education in pharmacology, treatment of chronic insomnia,
                              treatment of major depressive disorder, and medical
                              recordkeeping.
                  
                  (c)   I, Dr. Shomair, acknowledge that this Undertaking remains in effect
                        until the College determines its terms are satisfied.
                  
            D.    CONSENT

            (14)  I, Dr. Shomair, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide the
                  following information to any person who requires this information for the
                  purposes of facilitating my completion of the Professional Education:

                  (a)   any information the College has that led to the circumstances of my
                        entering into this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information arising from any investigation into, or assessment
                        of, my practice; and 
                  
                  (c)   any information arising from the monitoring of my compliance with
                        this Undertaking.
                  
            (15)  I, Dr. Shomair, give my irrevocable consent to the College to provide all
                  Chiefs of Staff with any information the College has that led to the
                  circumstances of my entering into this Undertaking and/or any information
                  arising from the monitoring of my compliance with this Undertaking.

            (16)  I, Dr. Shomair, give my irrevocable consent to any persons who facilitate
                  my completion of the Professional Education, and to all Chiefs of Staff,
                  to disclose to the College, and to one another, any of the following:

                  (a)   any information relevant to this Undertaking;
                  
                  (b)   any information relevant for the purposes of monitoring my
                        compliance with this Undertaking; and/or  
                  
                  (c)   any information which comes to their attention in the course of
                        providing the Professional Education and which they reasonably
                        believe indicates a potential risk of harm to my patients.

Previous Hearings Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 18 Dec 2012
Summary:

On December 18, 2012, the Discipline Committee found that Dr. Garry Yehudah Shomair failed 
to maintain the standard of practice of the profession in regard to his recordkeeping in 18 of 26 
charts and in regard to his psychiatric care and treatment of multiple patients, including in his 
diagnostic, psychopharmacological and monitoring practices. Dr. Shomair admitted the 
allegation. 
 
Dr. Shomair began clinical supervision in November 2010 pursuant to an  interim order under 
s.37 of the Health Professions Procedural Code. Since November 2011, Dr. Shomair's clinical 
supervisor indicates that Dr. Shomair's care meets the standard of practice. 
 
The Discipline Committee ordered and directed that: 
      the Registrar impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Shomair's 
      certificate of registration for the specified periods of time set out herein: 
      a)    Dr. Shomair shall, within thirty (30) days from the date of this Order, retain a 
            College-approved clinical supervisor, who will sign an undertaking in the form 
            attached hereto as Schedule "A" (the "Clinical Supervisor").  For a period of 
            twelve (12) months commencing on the day the Clinical Supervisor is retained, 
            Dr. Shomair may practice only under the supervision of the Clinical Supervisor, 
            who will meet with Dr. Shomair on a bi-weekly basis for the duration of the 
            supervision;    
      b)    Dr. Shomair shall abide by all recommendations of his Clinical Supervisor with 
            respect to his standard of practice in respect of, but not limited to, the treatment of 
            patients with bipolar disorder, medication dosages, pharmacotherapy and 
            record-keeping and documentation; 
      c)    Dr. Shomair shall consent to the disclosure by his Clinical Supervisor to the 
            College, and by the College to his Clinical Supervisor, of all information the 
            parties deem necessary or desirable in order to fulfill the Clinical Supervisor's 
            undertaking and to monitor Dr. Shomair's compliance with the Order.  This shall 
            include, without limitation, providing the Clinical Supervisor with the reports of 
            any assessments of Dr. Shomair's practice in the College's possession; 
      d)    Approximately six (6) months after the completion of the period of supervision 
            required by paragraph 3(a), Dr. Shomair shall undergo a re-assessment of his 
            clinical practice by a College-appointed assessor (the "Assessor(s)").  This 
            re-assessment will include determining whether Dr. Shomair meets the standard 
            of practice of the profession and whether Dr. Shomair is in compliance with this 
            Order.  The Assessor(s) shall make recommendations regarding Dr. Shomair's 
            practice and shall report the results of the re-assessment to the College.  The 
            College shall determine, in its sole discretion, what recommendations, if any, Dr. 
            Shomair must abide by and whether any of the recommendations will constitute 
            terms, conditions or limitations on his certificate or registration; 
      e)    Dr. Shomair shall consent to the disclosure to the Assessor(s) of the reports of the 
            Clinical Supervisor arising from the supervision, and shall consent to the sharing 
            of all information between the Clinical Supervisor, the Assessor(s) and the 
            College, as any of the parties deem necessary or desirable in order to fulfill their 
            respective obligations; 
f)    Dr. Shomair shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete an 
      educational program in medical record-keeping approved by the College, no later 
      than one (1) year from the date of this Order. 
g)    Dr. Shomair shall, at his own expense, participate in and successfully complete at 
      minimum two courses in pharmacology, approved by the College, no later than 
      one (1) year from the date of this Order.  The content of these courses shall 
      include the topic of child and adolescent psychopharmacology. 
h)    Dr. Shomair shall be responsible for any and all costs associated with 
      implementing the terms of this Order.  
              
Dr. Shomair attend before the panel to be reprimanded. 
Dr. Shomair pay to the College costs in the amount of $3,650 within thirty (30) days of 
the date of this Order. 
              


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): December 18, 2012

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: August 23, 2019
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Garry Yehudah Shomair to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective August 23, 2019:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Shomair engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his psychiatry practice. As a result of the investigation, Dr. Shomair will engage in professional education in pharmacology, treatment of chronic insomnia, treatment of major depressive disorder, and medical recordkeeping.