skip to content

Shojaei, Hadi

CPSO#: 94385

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018
EXPIRY DATE
30 Jun 2025
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Josephs Health Cente
710 Victoria Ave E
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 5P7
Phone: (807) 624-3400 Ext. 3502
Fax: 1-807-624-3522 Electoral District: 09

Additional Practice Location(s)

980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6029
Fax: (807) 684-5893
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. H. Shojaei Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 29 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Shojaei ( CPSO# 94385 )

Business Address:
St. Josephs Health Centre
710 Victoria Avenue East
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 5P7
Phone Number: (807) 624-3502

Business Address:
955 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Business Address:
1260 Golf Links Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 0A1
Phone Number: (807) 626-1234

Business Address:
525 Simpson Street
Thunder Bay ON  P7C 3J6
Phone Number: (807) 622-8235

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Care Group,Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective:01 Jul 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 23 Nov 2010
PEAP - CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 24 Nov 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2025

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2018 Active
             1.    Dr. Hadi Shojaei may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Physical
                        Medicine and Rehabilitation, Division of Clinical Sciences,
                        Northern Ontario School of Medicine, in which Dr. Shojaei holds an
                        academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
                  the date of issuance or when Dr. Shojaei no longer holds the academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Shojaei's
                        clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
                        conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Shojaei's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2018, and expires on June 30, 2025.
                  Upon renewal of Dr. Shojaei's academic appointment at the Northern
                  Ontario School of Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to
                  the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.