skip to content

Shoham-Hazon, Nir

CPSO#: 92658

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Jun 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Shoham, Nir (used until: 20 Oct 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Medical University of Semmelweis, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 19 Apr 2010 to 08 Jun 2010
PEAP - CF - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 09 Jun 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jan 2013
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2013