skip to content

Shoemaker, Patrick Joseph

CPSO#: 21880

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2009

Summary

Date of Death: 26-Nov-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1968

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1968
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1969
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2009