skip to content

Shoemaker, Christopher Alan

CPSO#: 28832

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Jul 1998
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1998

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
323 Chapel St
Suite 206
Ottawa ON  K1N 7Z2
Phone: 613 801 2144
Fax: 613 801 2144 Electoral District: 07

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:03 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. CHRISTOPHER ALAN SHOEMAKER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOEMAKER is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 21 May 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1998