skip to content

Shoebridge, Jeffrey James

CPSO#: 86563

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3350 Merrittville Hwy
Unit 2
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone: (905) 641-5556
Fax: (905) 641-5574 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Catharines General Hospital
1400 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (905) 684-1468
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Welland Hospital
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Fax: (905) 732-3268
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Canada
Phone: (905) 774-7431
Fax: (905) 774-6776
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. J. J. Shoebridge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Shoebridge ( CPSO# 86563 )

Business Address:
2 - 3350 Merrittville Hwy
Thorold ON  L2V 4Y6
Phone Number: (905) 641-5556

Business Address:
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
400 Broad Street West
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 774-7431

Business Address:
Greater Niagara General Hospital
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
St Catharines General Hospital
1400 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Welland Hospital
65 Third Street
Welland ON  L3B 4W6
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JEFFREY JAMES SHOEBRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHOEBRIDGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Western University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Western University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012