skip to content

Shobola, Oladayo Davidson

CPSO#: 97265

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 22 Apr 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 22 Apr 2016
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Ibadan, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 352
1720 Howard Avenue
Windsor ON  N8X 5A6
Phone: (519)255-6629
Fax: (519)253-9224 Electoral District: 01

Additional Practice Location(s)

Windsor Regional Hospital
Ouellette Campus
Department of Psychiatry
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Canada
Phone: 519973-4411 Ext. 33223
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Erie Shores HealthCare Leamington
Windsor Regional Hospital,Metropolitan Site Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 22 Apr 2016 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Sep 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 May 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 14 Sep 2017 Active
             Dr. Oladayo Davidson Shobola may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.