First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 03 Feb 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Feb 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 02 Feb 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 13 Sep 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Jan 2015 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 Nov 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Apr 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 22 Apr 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 31 Oct 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 12 May 2017 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 14 Sep 2017 |