skip to content

Shivakumar, Kuppuswami

CPSO#: 87805

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 23 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Tamil

Education:Tver State Medical Academy, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone: (705) 675-5900 Ext. 8234
Fax: (705) 671-3031 Electoral District: 08

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 206-207
2855 Markham Road
Scarborough
M1X 0C3
Toronto ON  M1X 0C3
Canada
Phone: 6479000420
Fax: 6479000422
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

344 Riverside Drive
Sudbury
Sudbury ON  P3E 1H7
Canada
Phone: 7055237100 Ext. 8036
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shivakumar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Shivakumar ( CPSO# 87805 )

Business Address:
Sudbury Regional Hospital
Department of Psychiatry
680 Kirkwood Drive
Sudbury ON  P3E 1X3
Phone Number: (705) 675-5900


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Sri Lanka

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:23 Apr 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective:23 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KUPPUSWAMI SHIVAKUMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIVAKUMAR is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Oct 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2010