skip to content

Shishkina, Anna

CPSO#: 114717

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2023

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education: Medical University of Gdansk Faculty of, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1-1280 Main St W
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: 4168419349 Electoral District: 04

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:30 Jun 2023 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANNA SHISHKINA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHISHKINA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 22 Sep 2018
AVP - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2022 to 30 Jun 2023
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2023 to 30 Jun 2024
CF - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2023