skip to content

Shireen, Zainab

CPSO#: 98222

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Mar 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Pushto, Urdu

Education:University of Peshawar, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
River run medical clinic
Unit 12
1525 Bristol Road West
Mississauga ON  L5M 4Z1
Phone: (905) 812-5555 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

19 Main Street West, Kingsville
Kingsville ON  N9Y 1H2
Canada
Phone: 1 (888) 740-87
County: County of Essex
Electoral District: 01

2280 Highway 12
Brechin ON  L0K 1B0
Canada
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

119 Tudhope St
Espanola ON  P5E 1S6
Canada
Phone: 1(705 )805 925
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

144 North Front St
Belleville ON  K8P 3B6
Canada
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

10739 County 2 Road
Grafton ON  K0K 2G0
Canada
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

181 Toronto Road, Unit 6
Port Hope ON  L1A 3V5
Canada
Phone: (289) 677 4069
Fax: (888) 600 4149
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

34A Queen Street North
Tottenham ON  L0G 1W0
Canada
Phone: (289) 780 0877
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

2600 County Road 43
Kemptville ON  K0G 1J0
Canada
Phone: (343) 700 3337
County: County of Leeds and Grenville
Electoral District: 06

575 Thornton Road North
Oshawa ON  L1J 8L5
Canada
Phone: (365) 800 6336
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

1040 Oliver Rd, Unit 103B
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5
Canada
Phone: (807) 700 4149
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Canada
Phone: (705) 980 0121
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

2201 Jockvale Rd
Nepean ON  K2J 4J9
Canada
Phone: (613) 909 6522
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

100-1200 Colonial Rd
Navan ON  K2B 1J5
Canada
Phone: 1(800) 818-325
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

420 Ninth St W
Cornwall ON  K6J 0B3
Canada
Phone: (613) 703 7373
County: County of Stormont, Dundas and Glengarry
Electoral District: 07

230 Bridge Street
Carleton Place ON  K7C 3G9
Canada
Phone: 1(888) 818 325
County: County of Lanark
Electoral District: 07

5299 Nauvoo Rd
Walford ON  N0M 2S0
Canada
Phone: (226) 799 3184
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

350 King St East
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Y3
Canada
Phone: (289) 799 3063
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

21 Colborne St,
Fenelon Falls ON  K0M 1N0
Canada
Phone: 1(888) 818 - 3
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

2942 finch ave
Scarborough ON  M1W 2T4
Canada
Phone: (647) 797 9490
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

15 Brenda Rd
Orangeville ON  L9W 3Y5
Canada
Phone: (519) 942 9500
County: County of Dufferin
Electoral District: 03

1428 Walkley Rd
Ottawa ON  K1V 6P5
Canada
Phone: (613) 909 6524
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

2263 Concession Rd, Unit 12
Brechin ON  L0K 1B0
Canada
Phone: (705) 484 5352
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

1218 15 b1
Kingston ON  K7L 0C4
Canada
Phone: (613) 777 1943
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

795 Gardners Rd
Kingston ON  K7M 7E6
Canada
County: County of Frontenac
Electoral District: 06

103B-1040 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5
Canada
Phone: 8077000395
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

44 Ottawa St west
Havelock ON  K0L 1Z0
Canada
Phone: 705-304-0018
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

90 Hastings Street North
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Canada
Phone: 613-704-1245
County: County of Hastings
Electoral District: 06

4781 HWY 11/17
Kakabeka Falls ON  P0T 1W0
Canada
Phone: 807-788-0832
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

6-1625 Sherbrooke St W
Peterborough ON  K9K 0E6
Canada
Phone: 705-304-1034
County: County of Peterborough
Electoral District: 06

2956 Highway 69N,Unit 2
Val Caron ON  P3N 1E3
Canada
Phone: 705-805-0194
County: Terr.District/Regional Municipality of Sudbury
Electoral District: 08

889 Exmouth St , Unit 3
Sarnia ON  N7T 5R3
Canada
Phone: 226-778-4811
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01

100 King St W
Chatham ON  N7M 6A9
Canada
Phone: 226-799-2603
County: County of Kent
Electoral District: 01

19-9225 Hwy 93, Midland, Ontario
Midland ON  L4R 4K4
Canada
Phone: (249) 492-6406
County: County of Simcoe
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Zainab Shireen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Shireen ( CPSO# 98222 )

Business Address:
44 Ottawa Street West
Havelock ON  K0L 1Z0
Phone Number: (705) 304-0018

Business Address:
19 Main Street West
Kingsville ON  N9Y 1H2

Business Address:
U 19 - 9225 Highway 93
Midland ON  L4R 4K4
Phone Number: (249) 492-6406

Business Address:
90 Hasting Street North
Bancroft ON  K0L 1C0
Phone Number: (613) 704-1245

Business Address:
889 Exmouth Street
Suite 3
Sarnia ON  N7T 5R3
Phone Number: (226) 778-4811

Business Address:
2956 Highway 69 North
Suite 2
Sudbury ON  P3N 1E3
Phone Number: (705) 805-0199

Business Address:
Suite 12
1525 Bristol Raod West
Mississauga ON  L5M 4Z1
Phone Number: (905) 812-5555

Business Address:
103B - 1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 7A5

Business Address:
100 King Street West
Chatham ON  N7M 6A9

Business Address:
4781 Highway 11/17
Kakabeka Falls ON  P0T 1W0

Business Address:
6 - 1625 Sherbrooke Street West
Peterborough ON  K9K 0E6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Dec 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZAINAB SHIREEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIREEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Dec 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Mar 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2015