skip to content

Shipman, Richard Trafford

CPSO#: 22925

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 03 Jul 1970
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1970

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 8
420 Hazeldean Rd
Kanata On K2L 4B2
Ottawa ON  K2P 1W5
Phone: (613) 836 4774 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Unit 11
1400 Clyde Ave
Nepean On
K2G 3J2
Ottawa ON  K2L 4B2
Canada
Phone: 613 727 7444
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 18 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. RICHARD TRAFFORD SHIPMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIPMAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 1967
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1970