skip to content

Shipley, William Franklin

CPSO#: 28002

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 13 Aug 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 1975

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: W.F. Shipley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 27 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St Regis Crescent S North York ON M3J 1Y6 Tele: 1-888-563-3732
Date Received: 15 Aug 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:01 Jul 1976 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Dec 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Aug 2019