skip to content

Shinghal, Tulika

CPSO#: 91379

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:Université de Montréal Faculté de Médeci, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
491 Eglinton Ave W
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone: 4167875511 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Michaels Hospital
8-163 CC North
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Canada
Phone: (416) 864-5279
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Baycrest Hospital
3560 Bathurst St
North York ON  M6A 2E1
Canada
Phone: (416) 785-2500
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Tulika Shinghal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 01 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. T. Shinghal ( CPSO# 91379 )

Business Address:
491 Eglinton Avenue West
Suite 101
Toronto ON  M5N 1A8
Phone Number: (416) 787-5511

Business Address:
8 - 163 CC North
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 864-5279

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Baycrest Hospital Toronto
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TULIKA SHINGHAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHINGHAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014