skip to content

Shin, Hyo Pum

CPSO#: 93708

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:Yonsei University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3200 Major Mackenzie Dr
Cortelluci Vaughan Hospital
Maple ON  L6A 4Z3
Phone: 9058831212 Ext. 5800
Fax: 9054173208 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

7777 Weston Road
Vaughan ON  L4L 0G9
Canada
Phone: 9056054744
Fax: 4169870585
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: H. P. Shin Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Shin ( CPSO# 93708 )

Business Address:
7777 Weston Rd
Vaughan ON  L4L 0G9
Phone Number: 9056054744

Business Address:
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:27 Mar 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HYO PUM SHIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 22 Sep 2010
AVP - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Paediatric Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 31 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2014