skip to content

Shih, Elizabeth Meiling

CPSO#: 86302

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Guelph Emergency Medicine Services
73 Delhi Street
Suite 103
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone: (519) 837-1401 Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Elizabeth Meiling Shih Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Shih ( CPSO# 86302 )

Business Address:
Guelph Emergency Medicine Services
73 Delhi Street
Suite 103
Guelph ON  N1E 6L9
Phone Number: (519) 837-1401

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ELIZABETH MEILING SHIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Emergency Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012