skip to content

Shih, David

CPSO#: 27392

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Apr 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Apr 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
485 Silvercreek Pkwy North, Unit 1
Guelph ON  N1H 7K5
Phone: 1-844-264-2993 Ext. 2513
Fax: 519-836-7459 Electoral District: 03

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Child and Adolescent Psychiatry Effective: 26 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. DAVID SHIH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1974 to 30 Jun 1975
PostGrad Yr 1 - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 04 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2016