skip to content

Shih, Andrew Wei-Yeh

CPSO#: 90758

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 08 Aug 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Dec 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan College of Me, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Andrew Shih Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 19 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective:07 Nov 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Transfusion Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Transfusion Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 6 - Transfusion Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 Aug 2017