skip to content

Shiga, Sarah Ann

CPSO#: 97527

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Jul 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
190 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone: (613) 798-5555 Ext. 19222
Fax: (613) 761-4432 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S. Shiga Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 06 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Shiga ( CPSO# 97527 )

Business Address:
190 Melrose Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4K7
Phone Number: (613) 798-5555

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SARAH ANN SHIGA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHIGA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 04 Jun 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
EL - Dermatology

Queen's University, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Sep 2014
EL - Plastic Surgery

University of Ottawa, 19 Jan 2015 to 30 Jan 2015
EL - Plastic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jan 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jul 2016