skip to content

Shier, John Dougall

CPSO#: 25620

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Aug 1988

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1972

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Accuro 700 Industrial Avenue Ottawa, ON K1G 0Y9 Tel: (613) 738-1242
Date Received: 11 Nov 2010

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1972
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 13 Aug 1981
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015