skip to content

Sheth, Hinal

CPSO#: 89113

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 11 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Citrus Medical Centre
2240 Lake Shore Blvd W
Unit 107
Etobicoke ON  M8V 0B1
Phone: 4168006500 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Citrus Medical Centre
2240 Lake Shore Blvd W
Unit 107
Toronto ON  M8V 0B1
Canada
Phone: 416-800-6500 Ext. 2
Fax: 416-342-1790
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hinal Sheth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Sheth ( CPSO# 89113 )

Business Address:
Suite 107
2240 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Toronto ON  M8V 0B1
Phone Number: (416) 800-6500

Business Address:
605 Royal York Road
Toronto ON  M8Y 4G5
Phone Number: (416) 800-6500

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HINAL SHETH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHETH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2010