skip to content

Sherwood, William Geoffrey

CPSO#: 29104

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of 01 Jun 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 7-May-2012

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Cambridge, 1970

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:16 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1971
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 1977
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 28 Oct 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1989
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 03 Aug 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2005
Suspension of registration imposed: Executive Committee Effective: 17 May 2006
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 09 Jan 2007
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 23 Jan 2007
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 01 Jun 2007