skip to content

Sherwin, Heather Nicole

CPSO#: 98793

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Magenta Health
418 Eglinton Avenue West
Unit 200
Toronto ON  M5N 1A2
Phone: 647-479-8410
Fax: 647-689-4619 Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 14 Jun 2017 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HEATHER NICOLE SHERWIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHERWIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 22 Sep 2012
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 May 2015
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Apr 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 May 2017 to 31 May 2017
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 2017